Accounts and annual returns PEDMORE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required