M. S. RESEARCH TREATMENT AND EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provides services, care, counselling, advice, information , sponsors and undertakes research in the field of multiple sclerosis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 January 1995: Standard registration
- MS RESEARCH (Working name)
- M.S. RESEARCH TRAINING AND EDUCATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- MS RESOLVE LTD (Previous name)
- MUSTER (MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS TRAINING EDUCATION AND RESEARCH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Clacy | Chair | 29 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Christine Singleton | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joiner | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.09k | £124.01k | £822.65k | £222.03k | £188.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.99k | £63.78k | £84.15k | £75.93k | £144.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £822.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £3 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £784.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £66.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £18.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £38.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 DEC 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
“THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, INCLUDING BY: • ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS BY CO-OPERATING WITH THE MEDICAL PROFESSION TO ENCOURAGE SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF AND CURE OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS (MS)AND TO AID AND AMELIORATE THE CONDITIONS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM IT; AND • PROMOTING AND FUNDING RESEARCH THAT CAN BE EXPECTED TO FURTHER THE UNDERSTANDING OF MS AND LEAD TO MORE EFFECTIVE CLINICAL TREATMENT TO DEVELOP OR TEST THERAPEUTIC EQUIPMENT AND INVESTIGATE METHODS OF SOCIAL MANAGEMENT OF THE DISEASE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.”
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VASSALL CENTRE
GILL AVENUE
FISHPONDS
BRISTOL
BS16 2QQ
- Phone:
- 07823322961
- Email:
- info@ms-research.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window