Financial history HALTON LODGE AND GRANGE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1043287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022 01/08/2023 01/08/2024
Total gross income £105.88k £90.39k £83.22k £86.76k £84.86k
Total expenditure £107.48k £92.02k £87.42k £96.83k £94.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A £82.73k £77.78k