Financial history DARUL-ULOOM SCHOOL LONDON

Charity number: 1043305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £314.01k £501.69k £572.05k £609.38k £575.72k
Total expenditure £498.88k £549.82k £610.60k £654.45k £665.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £84.03k £74.26k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £97.75k £96.48k £30.72k £30.57k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £403.93k £475.54k £578.49k £541.94k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £8 £40 £171 £3.21k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £30.57k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £549.82k £610.60k £654.45k £665.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £20.25k £18.82k £34.84k £29.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0