Trustees DARUL-ULOOM SCHOOL LONDON

Charity number: 1043305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Munaf Dilavar Patel Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
Billal Sabbir Baiyat Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Yasar Kabir Zaman Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Mohammed Khan Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
UMARJI HASAN PATEL Trustee 30 November 2011
None on record
ISMAIL VALI AHMED MALJEE Trustee
None on record