Financial history UPTON ST JOSEPHS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043307
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £2.84k £5.37k £5.67k £4.38k £3.58k
Total expenditure £428 £3.83k £2.25k £1.57k £2.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A