Financial history MIDLAND MENCAP

Charity number: 1043360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.56m £8.92m £9.08m £9.61m £10.99m
Total expenditure £8.04m £8.00m £8.15m £8.35m £8.95m
Income from government contracts £5.38m £5.79m £5.68m £6.18m £6.44m
Income from government grants £658.59k £1.15m £982.15k £595.34k £1.01m
Income - Donations and legacies £22.39k £1.26m £1.24m £920.98k £1.11m
Income - Other trading activities £9.95k £322 £1.46k £8.32k £16.63k
Income - Charitable activities £8.34m £7.56m £7.78m £8.56m £9.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £62.93k £55.95k £51.55k £109.90k £160.88k
Income - Other £123.01k £48.08k £9.11k £6.80k £34.41k
Income - Legacies £0 £19.19k £83.99k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.04m £8.00m £8.15m £8.35m £8.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.58k £0 £0 £0 £24.10k
Expenditure - Governance £103.78k £96.98k £117.10k £116.97k £35.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0