STEPPING STONES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides free counselling, psychoeducational courses and resources, group activities, education and outreach events to adults who have been sexually abused as children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £379,752 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 17 January 1995: Standard registration
- 28 November 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1207418 STEPPING STONES NORTH WALES
- Stepping Stones North Wales (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.13k | £543.80k | £532.26k | £545.76k | £461.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.85k | £392.67k | £491.71k | £502.85k | £525.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £107.98k | £107.98k | £107.98k | £107.98k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £106.69k | £346.94k | £377.83k | £394.84k | £379.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £539.71k | £508.76k | £536.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £5.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £22.71k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £36 | £22 | £1.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £4.05k | £765 | £1.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £388.03k | £483.44k | £500.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.51k | £3.84k | £4.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £4.64k | £8.27k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 18 May 2022
Charitable objects
A. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTION AND INDIVIDUAL AND GROUP COUNSELLING. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WORKING WITH THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION, CONSULTATION AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
CLWYD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window