Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF DUKINFIELD AND STALYBRIDGE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1043424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.16k £2.04k £9.30k £22.43k £18.95k
Total expenditure £8.52k £6.12k £9.21k £19.08k £19.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A