Accounts and annual returns GARSTANG COMMUNITY ACADEMY PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043455
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 13 July 2017 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 24 September 2015 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required