MAYA PRODUCTIONS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maya Productions makes diverse theatre to enable social change and racial justice in the arts. We make theatre led by Global Majority artists (African, South Asian, and Latin American Diasporas), we engage with young people and underrepresented communities through participatory arts projects and we promote workforce inclusion in the creative sector through training, research and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £89,667 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 January 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jaime Nabeta Goto | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Steel | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ferry Van Dijk | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Garvin | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anslem Onyenani | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shuang Teng | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Martin | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hoo | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Preston | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNA BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.61k | £52.35k | £120.68k | £165.67k | £141.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.32k | £40.56k | £79.69k | £117.28k | £171.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £25.36k | £87.10k | £36.51k | £89.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE DRAMATIC ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 LANDELLS ROAD
LONDON
SE22 9PQ
- Phone:
- 07866891648
- Email:
- info@mayaproductions.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window