Accounts and annual returns MOUNT NURSERY (BROSELEY)

Charity Number: 1043532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2022 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2022 277 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 March 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 March 2021 45 days late Download Open in new window