Financial history MOUNT NURSERY (BROSELEY)

Charity number: 1043532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £285.93k £316.00k £295.00k £339.00k £368.00k
Total expenditure £300.56k £277.00k £284.00k £358.00k £367.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £352.00k
Income from government grants N/A £49.00k N/A N/A N/A