Financial history GILLINGHAM AND SHAFTESBURY YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity Number: 1043548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/08/2019 06/08/2020 06/08/2021 06/08/2022 06/08/2023
Total gross income £1.73k £1.48k £514 £3.34k £3.34k
Total expenditure £1.90k £2.57k £1.32k £1.83k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A