GOSFORTH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carpet bowls, yoga classes, knitting and craft classes, musical baby singing, Community bingo, MS exercise class, children's parties, Wine group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 23 January 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Gray | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mumtaz Faiz | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Glenn | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.51k | £2.66k | £6.31k | £3.78k | £10.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.96k | £3.18k | £3.83k | £2.15k | £4.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GOSFORTH, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITITONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GOSFORTH, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gosforth Residents Association
Christon Road
Gosforth
Newcastle-upon-Tyne
Tyne and Wear
NE3 1XD
- Phone:
- 01912855433
- Email:
- tpeterglenn@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window