Financial history MORLEY MEMORIAL PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1043583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.95k £17.85k £13.78k £21.13k £24.66k
Total expenditure £14.30k £14.13k £7.22k £24.25k £55.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A