Financial history CIRCLES NETWORK

Charity Number: 1043601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.70m £1.84m £2.58m £2.72m £3.15m
Total expenditure £1.68m £1.66m £2.18m £2.38m £2.80m
Income from government contracts £1.20m £1.24m £1.29m N/A £1.10m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.50m £839.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.06k £1.75k £68.53k £111.43k £77.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.31m £1.64m £1.72m £1.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £288 £120 £1.92k £2.29k £13.11k
Income - Other £444.55k £527.27k £871.30k £882.12k £1.16m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.65m £2.18m £2.38m £2.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.15k £14.59k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.25k £12.19k £13.44k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0