Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF RICCALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1043644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 November 2022 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 March 2021 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required