Governing document FRIENDS OF RICCALL SCHOOL
Charity number: 1043644

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 5 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 09 Nov 2022 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
To promote and advance the education of the pupils and support the school by engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment not normally provided by the local education authority.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.