PARK HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising and making grants to Park Hill Junior School, Kenilworth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 27 January 1995: Standard registration
- PARK HILL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Kelman | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bradbury | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Nick Cluff | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Strelluf | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hattersley | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BIGGS | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.65k | £5.67k | £7.69k | £14.80k | £9.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.51k | £3.72k | £5.70k | £10.31k | £2.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.92k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 5TH OCTOBER 1994 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF PARK HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Hill Junior School
Parkfield Drive
KENILWORTH
Warwickshire
CV8 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01926 855974
- Email:
- admin2309@welearn365.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window