Accounts and annual returns THE QUEEN'S ROYAL HUSSARS (THE QUEEN'S OWN AND ROYAL IRISH) REGIMENTAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1043673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window