Trustees THE QUEEN'S ROYAL HUSSARS (THE QUEEN'S OWN AND ROYAL IRISH) REGIMENTAL CHARITY
Charity number: 1043673

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Retd Mark Cubitt | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Charles John Haines | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RSM Alastair Walker | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Nicholas Cowley OBE | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Alexander Porter | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Alexander James Innes Wilson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Retd Thomas Hamilton | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Major Retd Nicholas Entwistle | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Brigadier Ian Mortimer | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Colonel Retd Nigel Beer | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Major Retd David Innes-Lumsden | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retd Andrew Cuthbert | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retd RICHARD CURRIE CBE | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.