CHRISTIAN PARTNERS IN AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works with African partners on development programmes in Africa including: supporting the resettlement of children in Uganda from a Children's Home into families; supporting disadvantaged children though primary education in Uganda; supporting rural community groups in Uganda towards self reliance; supporting girls in university education in Ethiopia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Uganda
Governance
- 27 January 1995: Standard registration
- CPA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SHELBOURNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL QUINCEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY JANE SHELBOURNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND LEWIS EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.26k | £119.09k | £198.16k | £129.68k | £86.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.03k | £104.19k | £93.42k | £105.34k | £92.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BOTHY
WATERWHEEL LANE
BRANSTON
LINCOLN
LN4 1LU
- Phone:
- 01522275072
- Email:
- office@cpafrica.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window