Financial history EARLYBIRD DIABETES TRUST

Charity number: 1043719
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 30/06/2014
Total gross income £141.87k £98.54k £268.20k £161.35k £80.08k
Total expenditure £490.09k £309.90k £101.44k £247.47k £81.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A