EARLYBIRD DIABETES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical research project looking at reasons for the early onset of type 2 diabetes and childhood obesity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 30 January 1995: Standard registration
- 04 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.87k | £98.54k | £268.20k | £161.35k | £80.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £490.09k | £309.90k | £101.44k | £247.47k | £81.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 13 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 13 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 01 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 01 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 21 November 2012 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 21 November 2012 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 11 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 24 November 2011 | 24 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 1995, 25 FEBRUARY 1996, 31 MARCH 2003 AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSE AND COURSE OF CHILDHOOD DIABETES AND IN PARTICULAR THE EARLYBIRD DIABETES RESEARCH STUDY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window