THE DONNINGTON GROVE SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 31 January 1995: Standard registration
- 20 April 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE DONNINGTON GROVE JAPAN SOCIETY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 22 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 22 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING IN THE ARTS, LITERATURE, MUSIC, DANCE, DRAMA, HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, RELIGION, LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND WAY OF LIFE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND JAPAN. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH IN THE HISTORICAL, LITERARY, ARTISTIC, MUSICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, LINGUISTIC, RELIGIOUS AND DRAMATIC HISTORY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF JAPAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window