OASIS CHURCH (CHADWELL HEATH) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 31 January 1995: Standard registration
- OASIS CHURCH (Working name)
- OASIS CHURCH (CHADWELL HEATH) (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Augusta Hughes | Chair | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wright | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEBANANDHAN RATNARAJAH | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.13k | £17.63k | £22.42k | £45.73k | £46.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.76k | £12.55k | £19.44k | £25.88k | £27.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTIES OF ESSEX AND GREATER LONDON AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD (2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK IN PARTICULAR IN THE SAID COUNTIES AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD (3) TO ENGAGE IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF BENEFIT TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID COUNTIES OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MAYFAIR AVENUE
ROMFORD
RM6 6UD
- Phone:
- 07480217860
- Email:
- office@oasischurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window