ROSE OF PARBOLD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rose of Parbold is a wide beam canal boat specifically fitted out for use by special needs groups with wheelchair access throughout. A volunteer crew provides trips on the Leeds/Liverpool Canal in West Lancashire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 February 1995: Standard registration
- ROSE OF PARBOLD ENTERPRISES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN DENISE PRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Howard Thomas | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Smith | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Boynton | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Boynton | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY JOHN TAMLIN | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BRADSHAW | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WALKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
KIM LESLIE PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HOOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE MARIE SCHUMACHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.46k | £7 | £5.74k | £12.20k | £13.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.96k | £6.26k | £11.73k | £15.25k | £12.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN THE NORTH WEST BY PROVIDING A NARROW BOAT, OR SUCH OTHER SUITABLE BOAT, SUCH PERSONS HAVING NEED OF THOSE FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE,YOUTH,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Hall Brow Close
ORMSKIRK
L39 2YX
- Phone:
- 07837168721
- Email:
- amschumacher1@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window