Financial history FOREST TOWN PRIMARY AND NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1043786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.65k £1.96k £2.76k £10.17k £11.90k
Total expenditure £11.01k £7.67k £3.25k £9.76k £11.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A