Financial history C H I E F SUPPORT GROUP (CYSTICS OF HULL INDEPENDENT EQUIPMENT FUND)

Charity number: 1043840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £3.25k £1.30k £568 £2.65k £2.48k
Total expenditure £9.42k £650 £230 £1.54k £1.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A