Financial history THE MILES CLARK TRAVEL SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity Number: 1043842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.28k £4.79k £4.41k £4.66k £4.74k
Total expenditure £3.80k £0 £0 £3.95k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A