THE WORTHING MUSICAL COMEDY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular workshops for the youth company, supporting their learning in preparation for performance and participation in the local music festival. Meeting twice each week to rehearse and instruct members in readiness for planned performances. Attending local institutions - church, convalescent homes, hospices - to provide entertainment for residents/members and to promote the profile of WMCS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erin Wilcock | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lamorna Webb | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Reynolds | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hart | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DENIS FULLER | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Karen Dunn | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Warwick Reynolds | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNN FULLER | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Emerson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.26k | £36.53k | £28.42k | £101.91k | £139.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.09k | £18.13k | £17.89k | £100.15k | £124.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/01/1995 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC ART, PARTICULARLY THE ART OF MUSICAL THEATRE, BY THE PRODUCTION OF MUSICAL PLAYS. B) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE BOARD SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worthing Musical Comedy Society
2a The Drive
Worthing
BN11 5LL
- Phone:
- 07803178508
- Email:
- info@wmcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window