FRIENDS OF TEMPLEMOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general fundraising : fairs and sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Trafford
Governance
- 03 February 1995: Standard registration
- TEMPLEMOOR INFANT SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Magdalena Walker | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Whitney | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Nicola Allen | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Janet Pain | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.63k | £10.10k | £8.45k | £12.60k | £18.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.58k | £17.93k | £2.64k | £11.39k | £12.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1985 AS AMENDED 5TH JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND FURTHER AMENDED 3RD APRIL 2000 AND 25TH SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Templemoor Infant School
Nursery Close
SALE
M33 2EG
- Phone:
- 0161 969 1622
- Email:
- templemoorfot@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window