Accounts and annual returns THE GARY PORTER FUND FOR SICK CHILDREN

Charity Number: 1043888
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required