JULIE GRAHAM CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 04 February 1995: Standard registration
- 03 February 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
- JULIE GRAHAM TOY LIBRARY GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 23 March 2005 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 23 March 2005 | 51 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED ON THE 26 SEPTEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF ALL LOCAL CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE COUNTY DURHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window