ANNESLEY PRIMARY AND NURSERY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1043953
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim is to provide additional funds to purchase resources to enable enriching activities to take place in school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019

Total income: £36,191
Total expenditure: £26,850

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 February 1995: Standard registration
  • 20 September 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 20 September 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £10.40k £24.40k £42.84k £45.22k £36.19k
Total expenditure £12.77k £24.24k £31.76k £49.23k £26.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 January 2020 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2020 200 days late