CARERS OF LEICESTERSHIRE ADVOCACY AND SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services for carers in Leicester, Leicestershire & Rutland inc Information & advice, training for carers, self-advocacy sessions, social activities, health and wellbeing sessions for carers. Advice and information for professionals working with carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £84,368 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 07 February 1995: Standard registration
- C L A S P (Working name)
- CLASP THE CARERS CENTRE (Working name)
- THE CARERS CENTRE LEICESTER (Working name)
- THE CARERS CENTRE LEICESTERSHIRE (Working name)
- THE CARERS CENTRE LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND (Working name)
- THE CARERS CENTRE RUTLAND (Working name)
- CARERS OF LEICESTERSHIRE ACTION AND SUPPORT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheela Solanki | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bharat Thankey | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Carter | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
charles huddleston | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hill | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Worrall | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.99k | £187.11k | £172.55k | £149.20k | £209.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.84k | £155.61k | £194.78k | £178.26k | £192.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.93k | £15.00k | £12.55k | £7.51k | £84.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CARERS IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Carers Centre LLR
Voluntary Action Leicestershire
9 Newarke Street
leicester
LE1 5SN
- Phone:
- 01162510999
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window