SOUTH LEEDS AND MORLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides educational services to children and young adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
217 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 February 1995: Standard registration
- 20 February 2017: Funds received from 524781 14TH MORLEY (TINGLEY) SCOUT GROUP
- MORLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- SOUTH LEEDS AND MORLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Stuart Littledyke | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean William Carr | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Falkingham | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jean Leach | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George William Neil | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Morris | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Fell | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edwin James Kirkwood | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Luby | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ken Grayson | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW JAMES HEBDEN | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £115.42k | £105.04k | £113.59k | £157.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.78k | £94.50k | £69.49k | £82.93k | £94.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.86k | £21.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Woodkirk Gardens
DEWSBURY
WF12 7HZ
- Phone:
- 07792 594840
- Email:
- dc@slamscouts.org.uk
- Website:
-
slamscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window