BURGHCLERE PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1043996
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ACTIVITIES: The group provides facilities to enable the requirements of the charitable objects to be met. OBJECTIVES: To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £150,188
Total expenditure: £110,976

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BURGHCLERE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
  • EARLSTONE NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE NEAl Chair 02 May 2024
None on record
Eleanor Crew Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Anna Miles Trustee 04 November 2024
None on record
Benjamin Miles Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Marie - Therese Josephine Moore Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Hayley Lynch Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £117.21k £78.56k £66.57k £91.19k £150.19k
Total expenditure £99.54k £77.43k £78.79k £85.73k £110.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.75k £42.30k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 July 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 July 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 January 2021 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 January 2021 197 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Portal Hall
Church Lane
Burghclere
NEWBURY
RG20 9HX
Phone:
01635276026