UNITED KINGDOM NATIONAL EXTERNAL QUALITY ASSESSMENT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity shall be to advance education and promote the preservation of good health by providing or securing the provision of external quality assessment services for clinical laboratories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 1995: Standard registration
- UK NEQAS (Working name)
- PATHOLOGY QUALITY ASSESSMENT (Previous name)
- UNITED KINGDOM NATIONAL EXTERNAL QUALITY ASSESMENT SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Parry | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy De'Ath | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Scott | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gwen Wark | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mahmood Sadigh | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chantell Hodgson | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sanjiv Rughooputh | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melody Tabiner | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Haggas | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Joy Louise Treacy | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dina Patel | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Marrington | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Doris-Ann Williams | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara De La Salle | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.65k | £234.45k | £226.85k | £251.37k | £273.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.94k | £201.15k | £213.68k | £240.64k | £294.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JAN 1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2016 as amended on 21 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING OR SECURING THE PROVISION OF EXTERNAL QUALITY ASSESSMENT SERVICES FOR CLINICAL LABORATORIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Offices 5-6
Community Stadium
Sheffield Olympic Legacy Park
Worksop Road
SHEFFIELD
- Phone:
- 01142611689
- Email:
- CentralOffice@ukneqas.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.