Financial history JAMIA AL-HAFSAH (ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL TRUST)

Charity number: 1044016
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £645 £0 £0 £0 £170.00k
Total expenditure £3.28k £0 £0 £0 £2.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A