THE MILITARY ORDER OF THE COLLAR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation operates as a grant making organisation in the areas of poverty relief and education in less developed and developing nations mainly. Occasionally we assist UK based charities, primarily involved in the welfare and well being of children and in the emergency services sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of Westminster
- India
- United States
Governance
- 10 February 1995: Standard registration
- M O C CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- MOC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF JOSE CARLOS MARTINES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Parsons | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Lane | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Araldo Adolfo Crawford Garcia | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Paul Anthony Atkinson | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jon Lane | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ronald Cavanagh | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM SCREECH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURIZIO FANTATO FRSA, FRGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.37k | £33.09k | £23.02k | £120.79k | £36.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.35k | £20.48k | £29.66k | £44.57k | £45.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1995 as amended on 24 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE SOUTHERN ENGLAND PLUS WALES)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leadon Valley Accountancy Ltd
136 Bridge Street
LEDBURY
Herefordshire
HR8 2AS
- Phone:
- 07903506273
- Email:
- info@mocfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window