THE HILDA GRAHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT OF HANDICAPPED PEOPLE FROM CORNWALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 13 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON RETALLACK | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aurelia Retallack Antonowicz | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £1.44k | £1.82k | £3.55k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64k | £9.32k | £5.51k | £2.67k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1) THE SUPPORT OF CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANISATIONS WHICH THEMSELVES PROVIDE ACCOMODATION AND RELIEF FOR HANDICAPPED PEOPLE IN OR FROM THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL. 2) OTHERWISE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES IN THE EVENT THAT THE ABOVE PRINCIPLE OBJECT SHALL NOT BE CAPABLE OF ATTAINMENT FOR THE ROYAL STAR AND GARTER HOME OF RICHMOND, SURREY TW10 6RR
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAKER STREAM HOUSE
GASTON LANE
UPPER FARRINGDON
ALTON
HAMPSHIRE
GU34 3EE
- Phone:
- 07739136775
- Email:
- SRETALLACK@LIVE.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window