BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administrative, departmental and evangelistic support to the witness, educational and humanitarian activities of local congregations, Stanborough Primary and Secondary schools, the regional offices in the British Isles and the Republic of Ireland through evangelistic resources, policy and guideline documentation and interest focused seminars, workshops and accredited training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£19,938,503
Donations and legacies | £15.07m | |
Charitable activities | £3.93m | |
Other trading activities | £35.36k | |
Investments | £907.51k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£17,480,226
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £17.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£17,422 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £17.48m | |
Retained for future use | £2.46m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £17.48m | |
Retained for future use | £2.48m |
People

120 Employee(s)
29 Trustee(s)
10657 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Eglan Brando Brooks | Chair | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Steve Palmer | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Adam Charles Keough | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacques Stephen Venter | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Augustus Lawrence | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dusanka Rancic | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Nerine Barrett | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Stephen Currow | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Graham Allcock | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Krisztian Andrasi | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Dafydd Lethbridge | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Jovan Adamovic | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Pardon Shingirai Chenjerai | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Darren Johnson | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Fortune Mahlangu | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sharon Platt-McDonald | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Michael James Botha | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Lady Sally-Ann Flemmings-Danquah | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sam Alphanso Walters | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Eleazer Paul Dorairaj | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Billett | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Michael Ian Walker | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Patricia Foriwaa Ababio | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ALBERT MARK GARDINER | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Wederly Aguiar | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Herminia Mathieu | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Naomi Rosetta Ninvalle | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Pastor Kirk Thomas | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Elisabeth Sanguesa | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.24m | £15.50m | £20.43m | £17.58m | £19.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.46m | £12.42m | £16.94m | £17.67m | £17.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.63m | £9.79m | £16.89m | £12.74m | £15.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £433.11k | £0 | £0 | £104.21k | £35.36k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.03m | £5.58m | £3.39m | £3.35m | £3.93m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £128.33k | £64.05k | £33.23k | £1.33m | £907.51k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.76k | £66.44k | £116.87k | £50.28k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £268.61k | £208.84k | £211.33k | £83.83k | £133.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.46m | £12.42m | £16.94m | £17.67m | £17.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.12k | £68.68k | £115.02k | £75.24k | £94.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £911.67k | £765.84k | £992.38k | £1.06m | £2.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £33.86m | £33.38m | £34.02m | £33.62m | £33.52m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £155.00k | £155.00k | £200.00k | £200.00k | |
|
Other assets | £16.33m | £18.67m | £16.85m | £18.48m | £20.77m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.74m | -£12.14m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.56m | £4.74m | £1.78m | £1.42m | £2.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/1996 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/2001 AS AMENDED ON 26/07/2006 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2016 as amended on 22 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROCLAIM THE EVERLASTING GOSPEL OF OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST, TO TEACH THE COMMANDMENTS OF GOD AS THE SUPREME RULE OF LIFE AND TO PERSUADE PEOPLE TO BECOME HIS DISCIPLES AND RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE WORK WHICH IS IN HARMONY WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Linked charities
- 11 February 1995 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Union Conference
Stanborough Park
Watford
WD25 9JZ
- Phone:
- 01923672251
- Email:
- secretariat@adventist.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window