ANIMALS AT RISK SHELTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Replaced 5 old pens with 11 pens and one large cat unit, which comply with new legislation for boarding catteries, keeping in front of any proposed future legislation on animal accommodation for animal rescue groups. Commenced replacements for the remaing facilities. We have continued with our ever important spaying and neutering work and education on animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 14 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET MORRISON MORRISON | Chair | 06 June 1994 |
|
|
||||
MR W HADDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.41k | £327.81k | £241.49k | £367.88k | £121.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.10k | £56.57k | £325.53k | £64.60k | £113.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND ALLEVIATION OF ANIMAL SUFFERING (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE (B)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
341 ASHCROFT ROAD
LUTON
LU2 9AE
- Phone:
- 01582728853
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window