SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1044110
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School uniform, photos, milk, trips, fund raising for other charities and for the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income: £2,916
Total expenditure: £2,951
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- East Sussex
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 February 1995: Standard registration
- 19 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.92k | £4.14k | £6.77k | £7.17k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.43k | £3.52k | £7.40k | £7.29k | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 03 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 10 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 07 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF RODMELL CE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE RODMELL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window