Accounts and annual returns LITTLE PIPPINS PRE-SCHOOL GREENMEADOW

Charity Number: 1044128
Charity reporting is up to date (291 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 April 2025 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 April 2025 291 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 March 2025 635 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 March 2025 640 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 June 2024 719 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 June 2024 719 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window