Financial history LITTLE PIPPINS PRE-SCHOOL GREENMEADOW

Charity number: 1044128
Charity reporting is up to date (291 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £326.50k £317.92k £306.44k £343.14k £412.28k
Total expenditure £354.15k £315.49k £372.57k £359.52k £409.80k
Income from government contracts N/A £239.38k £237.58k N/A £302.85k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A