Financial history WALSALL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1044133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £779.94k £924.48k £1.34m £1.25m £1.41m
Total expenditure £803.10k £905.64k £1.19m £1.26m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £66.52k £461.70k £564.42k £506.36k £738.17k
Income from government grants N/A £133.54k £75.83k £81.37k £100.48k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £133.54k £75.83k £125.55k £123.60k
Income - Other trading activities £3.54k £3.22k £1.65k £2.66k £292.46k
Income - Charitable activities £776.41k £787.72k £1.27m £1.12m £992.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £803.10k £905.64k £1.19m £1.26m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £29.34k £13.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0