Financial history TYTHERINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1044137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.40k £2.78k £6.84k £13.98k £15.06k
Total expenditure £16.26k £9.28k £4.36k £10.63k £12.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A